THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:04:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984