THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:03:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 700
1235 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 388-1455
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 61 Yorkville Avenue
#1015
Toronto Ontario M5R 1B7
Phone: 647-748-=1455
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 61 Yorkville Avenue
#1015
Toronto Ontario M5R 1B7
Phone: 647-748-=1455
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - Colorado
USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Nitsch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 700
1235 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 388-1455
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 61 Yorkville Avenue
#1015
Toronto Ontario M5R 1B7
Phone: 647-748-=1455
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 61 Yorkville Avenue
#1015
Toronto Ontario M5R 1B7
Phone: 647-748-=1455
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - Colorado
USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Nitsch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA ANN NITSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NITSCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA ANN NITSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NITSCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984