THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:26:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: Mansfield, Debra Lynn (Used Until: 21 Jul 2014)
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.L. Katchen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: Mansfield, Debra Lynn (Used Until: 21 Jul 2014)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.L. Katchen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRA LYNN KATCHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATCHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRA LYNN KATCHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATCHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984