THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:43:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Telephone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 26 May 2020

Instructions/Address: Patients can access a copy of their medical record by contacting Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc, at 111 St Regis Crescent S, North York, ON M3J 1Y6, phone: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 18 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Telephone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 26 May 2020

Instructions/Address: Patients can access a copy of their medical record by contacting Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc, at 111 St Regis Crescent S, North York, ON M3J 1Y6, phone: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 18 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984