THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:39:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 369 Mary St.
Wiarton Ontario N0H 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195342411
Fax: 5195342413

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeff Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

Corporation Name: Jeff Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 369 Mary St.
Wiarton Ontario N0H 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195342411
Fax: 5195342413

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeff Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

Corporation Name: Jeff Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY MAXIMILIAN FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY MAXIMILIAN FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984