THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:20:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gateway Community Health
41 McClellan Street
Tweed Ontario K0K 3J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1619 Queen St E
Toronto ON M4L 1G4
Phone: 416-778-5858
Extension: 112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cdn Centre for Victims of Torture
194 Jarvis Street
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5B 2B7
Phone: 416-363-1066
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gateway Community Health
41 McClellan Street
Tweed Ontario K0K 3J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1619 Queen St E
Toronto ON M4L 1G4
Phone: 416-778-5858
Extension: 112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cdn Centre for Victims of Torture
194 Jarvis Street
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5B 2B7
Phone: 416-363-1066
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WENDELL LORNE BLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WENDELL LORNE BLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984