THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:15:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
595 Elm Place
Highland Park Illinois 60035
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 847-681-8821
Fax: 847-681-8922

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
595 Elm Place
Highland Park Illinois 60035
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 847-681-8821
Fax: 847-681-8922

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSIE LEIGH TENORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSIE LEIGH TENORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984