THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:38:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 234 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 407
Toronto Ontario M4P 1K5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 4169227222
Fax: 4169223188

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 234 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 407
Toronto Ontario M4P 1K5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 4169227222
Fax: 4169223188

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HY BLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HY BLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984