THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:21:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-125 Somerset St W
Ottawa ON K2P 0H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-230-0586
Fax: 8559303659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane B. Evans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Evans (CPSO#: 54146 )
Business Address: 201-125 Somerset St W
Ottawa ON K2P 0H7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-125 Somerset St W
Ottawa ON K2P 0H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-230-0586
Fax: 8559303659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane B. Evans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Evans (CPSO#: 54146 )
Business Address: 201-125 Somerset St W
Ottawa ON K2P 0H7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE BROWNING EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE BROWNING EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984