THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:52:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
DOCUdavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
North York, ON M6B 3Z4

Phone: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 21 Apr 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dunning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
DOCUdavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
North York, ON M6B 3Z4

Phone: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 21 Apr 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dunning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984