THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:36:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: To request your records, please visit www.rasci.ca where you can make an online request for your medical file. If you have any questions or need further assistance, you can also email [email protected].
Website: www.rasci.ca
Date Received: 10 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lawrence Sklar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 May 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: To request your records, please visit www.rasci.ca where you can make an online request for your medical file. If you have any questions or need further assistance, you can also email [email protected].
Website: www.rasci.ca
Date Received: 10 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lawrence Sklar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 May 2015

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 09 Dec 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984