THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:46:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON., M3J 1Y6. Telephone: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: 416-398-5932.
Date Received: 13 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Henry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON., M3J 1Y6. Telephone: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: 416-398-5932.
Date Received: 13 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Henry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984