THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 May 2003
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fiona Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Campbell (CPSO#: 54230 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 May 2003
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fiona Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Campbell (CPSO#: 54230 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2009
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2009
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Fiona Anne Campbell may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Anaesthesia, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Campbell holds a geographical full-time teaching or research
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire when Dr.
Campbell no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Fiona Anne Campbell may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Anaesthesia, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Campbell holds a geographical full-time teaching or research
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire when Dr.
Campbell no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Sep 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 May 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984