THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:49:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record can contact Records Management Ltd: 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto, ON., M9L 0A3, Telephone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 01 Feb 2022

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
Health Information Services
1 High Meadow Place. Unit 13
Toronto, Ont
M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093 or 1-647-693-7735
Date Received: 31 Dec 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosalie and Christopher Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record can contact Records Management Ltd: 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto, ON., M9L 0A3, Telephone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 01 Feb 2022

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
Health Information Services
1 High Meadow Place. Unit 13
Toronto, Ont
M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093 or 1-647-693-7735
Date Received: 31 Dec 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosalie and Christopher Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Feb 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984