THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 22:33:44 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 12 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener, Ontario
N2G 1G3
Date Received: 16 Feb 2010

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Suite 305
99 Northfield Drive East
Waterloo, Ontario
N2K 3P9
Date Received: 26 Nov 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth A. Kobayashi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jul 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 12 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener, Ontario
N2G 1G3
Date Received: 16 Feb 2010

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Suite 305
99 Northfield Drive East
Waterloo, Ontario
N2K 3P9
Date Received: 26 Nov 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth A. Kobayashi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jul 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH ALAN KOBAYASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBAYASHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH ALAN KOBAYASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBAYASHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984