THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: PO Box 64718 Unionville
Markham, Ontario
L3R 0M9
Date Received: 15 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: PO Box 64718 Unionville
Markham, Ontario
L3R 0M9
Date Received: 15 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984