THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:27:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient Records can be obtained at the following locations:

Kingston General Hospital/Hotel Dieu Hospital
76 Stewart Street
Kingston ON K2L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666

Perth Smith Falls Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON K7H 2K1
Phone: 613-267-1500

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: 613-345-5645

Belleville General Hospital
265 East Dundas Street
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: 613-969-7400
Date Received: 26 Jul 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.J. Justinich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Nov 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient Records can be obtained at the following locations:

Kingston General Hospital/Hotel Dieu Hospital
76 Stewart Street
Kingston ON K2L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666

Perth Smith Falls Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON K7H 2K1
Phone: 613-267-1500

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: 613-345-5645

Belleville General Hospital
265 East Dundas Street
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: 613-969-7400
Date Received: 26 Jul 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.J. Justinich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Nov 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Aug 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 1994

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984