THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:25:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling avenue
Suite D103
Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 16574
Fax: (613) 761-4665

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 04 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. O'Keefe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling avenue
Suite D103
Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 16574
Fax: (613) 761-4665

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 04 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. O'Keefe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRAH LYNN O'KEEFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'KEEFE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRAH LYNN O'KEEFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'KEEFE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984