THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:44:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 324 Goldstream Ave
Westshore Community Health Centre Pacific Centre Family Services
Colwood BC V9B 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 250.478.8357
Fax: 250.478.3699

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael J. Dillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 May 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 324 Goldstream Ave
Westshore Community Health Centre Pacific Centre Family Services
Colwood BC V9B 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 250.478.8357
Fax: 250.478.3699

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael J. Dillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 May 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES DILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DILLON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES DILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DILLON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 20 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984