THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 09:39:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 25 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin R. Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 May 2025

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin R. Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 25 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin R. Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 May 2025

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin R. Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984