THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:29:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bialystok University, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 4 - 1100 Dundas St W
Mississauga, ON
L5C 4E7
Date Received: 01 Jun 2020

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, www.recordsregistry.ca, or Unit 13 - 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Bialystok University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 4 - 1100 Dundas St W
Mississauga, ON
L5C 4E7
Date Received: 01 Jun 2020

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, www.recordsregistry.ca, or Unit 13 - 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bialystok University, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984