THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:50:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1973
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG, VISAYAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG, VISAYAN
Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 31 Aug 2021
Summary:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Quirante-Flora’s knowledge, skill, and judgment. As a result, Dr. Quirante-Flora has resigned from the College effective August 31, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after that date. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 31 Aug 2021
Summary:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Quirante-Flora’s knowledge, skill, and judgment. As a result, Dr. Quirante-Flora has resigned from the College effective August 31, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after that date. 

Training

Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Aug 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984