THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:54:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Leamington Family Health Team
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-322-1100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Leamington Family Health Team
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-322-1100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STUART IAN MUSGRAVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSGRAVE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STUART IAN MUSGRAVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSGRAVE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 16 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984