THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:43:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Terrace On The Square
Suite 204 Level Two
8 -10 Rowan Street
St John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (709) 738-8883
Fax: (709) 738-8898
Address: Health Care Corporation of
St John's
The General Hospital Health Science
300 Prince Phillip Drive
St John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-6300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Terrace On The Square
Suite 204 Level Two
8 -10 Rowan Street
St John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (709) 738-8883
Fax: (709) 738-8898
Address: Health Care Corporation of
St John's
The General Hospital Health Science
300 Prince Phillip Drive
St John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-6300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE ELIZABETH WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE ELIZABETH WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984