THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:43:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7482
Fax: (416) 813-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7482
Fax: (416) 813-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ETIENNE BERTRAND SOCHETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOCHETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ETIENNE BERTRAND SOCHETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOCHETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984