THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Jun 2007
Summary of Decision:
On June 18, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Metcalfe to have committed professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee ordered the following:


1 The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Metcalfe(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, one (1) month of which shall be suspended if Dr. Metcalfe successfully completes, at his own expense, the College(s Ethics Course and provides proof thereof to the College, to be completed by December 31, 2007.

2 The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Metcalfe to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00.

3. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Metcalfe to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 18, 2007

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Jun 2007
Summary of Decision:
On June 18, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Metcalfe to have committed professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee ordered the following:


1 The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Metcalfe(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, one (1) month of which shall be suspended if Dr. Metcalfe successfully completes, at his own expense, the College(s Ethics Course and provides proof thereof to the College, to be completed by December 31, 2007.

2 The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Metcalfe to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00.

3. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Metcalfe to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 18, 2007

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Apr 2025
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 04 Nov 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984