THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:00:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 573-4801
Fax: (905) 573-4802
Address: West Niagara Mental Health Team
167A Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
Phone: (905) 309-3336
Fax: (905) 309-4446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Webb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 573-4801
Fax: (905) 573-4802
Address: West Niagara Mental Health Team
167A Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
Phone: (905) 309-3336
Fax: (905) 309-4446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Webb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN PAUL WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN PAUL WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 1988

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1984