THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:08:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should contact Command Service to request a copy of their medical records
Command Service
100 Piccadilly Street
London ON N6A 1R8
Tel: 1-888-335-3379
519-672-1460
Date Received: 07 Jul 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should contact Command Service to request a copy of their medical records
Command Service
100 Piccadilly Street
London ON N6A 1R8
Tel: 1-888-335-3379
519-672-1460
Date Received: 07 Jul 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1984