THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:20:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seen at the Workplace Safety and Insurance Board please contact the WSIB.
For patients seen at the Office of the Chief Coroner of Ontario please contact the Coroner's Office.
For patients seen at either the Toronto General Hospital or St Michael's Hospital please contact that hospital.
For patients seen at the First Canadian Place Medical Centre please contact the Doctor's Office at the Royal Bank Plaza.
Date Received: 27 May 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seen at the Workplace Safety and Insurance Board please contact the WSIB.
For patients seen at the Office of the Chief Coroner of Ontario please contact the Coroner's Office.
For patients seen at either the Toronto General Hospital or St Michael's Hospital please contact that hospital.
For patients seen at the First Canadian Place Medical Centre please contact the Doctor's Office at the Royal Bank Plaza.
Date Received: 27 May 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1984