THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:28:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 121 VISION PARK BLVD UNIT 200
SHENANDOAH TEXAS 77384
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2817256767
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact DocuDavit Solutions at 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4, 1-888-781-9083 (phone), 1-866-297-9338 (fax), www.docudavit.com or they may contact Dr. Rashmy Amuthan (CPSO# 115278) at Towne Centre Medical and Aesthetic Clinic, 201-3601 Highway 7, Markham, ON, L3R 0M3, 905-604-3336 (phone)
Date Received: 02 Nov 2020

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brigitte Monrose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 121 VISION PARK BLVD UNIT 200
SHENANDOAH TEXAS 77384
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2817256767
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact DocuDavit Solutions at 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4, 1-888-781-9083 (phone), 1-866-297-9338 (fax), www.docudavit.com or they may contact Dr. Rashmy Amuthan (CPSO# 115278) at Towne Centre Medical and Aesthetic Clinic, 201-3601 Highway 7, Markham, ON, L3R 0M3, 905-604-3336 (phone)
Date Received: 02 Nov 2020

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brigitte Monrose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIGITTE MARIE ANTOINETTE ELIZABETH MONROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONROSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIGITTE MARIE ANTOINETTE ELIZABETH MONROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONROSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 1984