THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:07:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13
Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3
Canada

Toll Free: 1 800 775 0093
Fax: 647 933 2904
Date Received: 04 Feb 2022

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place Unit 13
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 28 Jan 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13
Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3
Canada

Toll Free: 1 800 775 0093
Fax: 647 933 2904
Date Received: 04 Feb 2022

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place Unit 13
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 28 Jan 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Mar 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Leger to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 28th, 2022:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Léger engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general medicine practice.   Dr. Léger has resigned from the College. He has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Mar 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Leger to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 28th, 2022:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Léger engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general medicine practice.   Dr. Léger has resigned from the College. He has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1984