THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GAELIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can email: [email protected]
Date Received: 06 Apr 2022

Instructions/Address: Stratford Medical
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GAELIC
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can email: [email protected]
Date Received: 06 Apr 2022

Instructions/Address: Stratford Medical
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1984