THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:37:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Contact Records Management
Records Management
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
toll free 1.800.775.0093 - fax: 1.888.316.4125
[email protected]
Date Received: 29 Nov 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Contact Records Management
Records Management
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
toll free 1.800.775.0093 - fax: 1.888.316.4125
[email protected]
Date Received: 29 Nov 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 06 Aug 2010
Summary of Decision:
On August, 6, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Alcock has committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)34 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming for a physician he was found guilty of the criminal offences of assault and Theft Under $5,000, in 2000 and 2003, respectively.
Regarding the assault conviction, Dr. Alcock attempted to physically remove his then common law wife from the couch against her will after a dispute arose over her smoking a cigarette inside the house. Dr. Alcock received a suspended sentence and six months probation. The theft conviction related to stealing groceries from a store. Dr. Alcock received a suspended sentence and one year probation and was ordered to participate in such counselling as probation might advise.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Alcock appear before it to be reprimanded.
2. Dr. Alcock pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 5-6, 2010

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 06 Aug 2010
Summary of Decision:
On August, 6, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Alcock has committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)34 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming for a physician he was found guilty of the criminal offences of assault and Theft Under $5,000, in 2000 and 2003, respectively.
Regarding the assault conviction, Dr. Alcock attempted to physically remove his then common law wife from the couch against her will after a dispute arose over her smoking a cigarette inside the house. Dr. Alcock received a suspended sentence and six months probation. The theft conviction related to stealing groceries from a store. Dr. Alcock received a suspended sentence and one year probation and was ordered to participate in such counselling as probation might advise.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Alcock appear before it to be reprimanded.
2. Dr. Alcock pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 5-6, 2010

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 19 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 1984