THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:12:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Karnatak Institute of Medical Science, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KANNADA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: As of December 20, 2023, patient medical records will be stored and managed at:

RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 12 Dec 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. N. Swamy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KANNADA
Medical School: Karnatak Institute of Medical Science, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: As of December 20, 2023, patient medical records will be stored and managed at:

RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 12 Dec 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. N. Swamy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Karnatak Institute of Medical Science, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1988
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1984