THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:14:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Bayly Street West
Suite 100, Level 1
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 426-2233
Fax: (905) 426-3306
Address: Ajax Pickering Health Centre
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Extension: 1478
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hamdi Benfayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Bayly Street West
Suite 100, Level 1
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 426-2233
Fax: (905) 426-3306
Address: Ajax Pickering Health Centre
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Extension: 1478
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hamdi Benfayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMDI HELAL BENFAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENFAYED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMDI HELAL BENFAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENFAYED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Garyounis University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 1997
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Oct 1996
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1997

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 1996

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 1985