THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 05 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Management
13-1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 15 Jan 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 05 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Management
13-1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 15 Jan 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 04 Nov 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 1985