THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:43:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brockton And Area
Family Health Team
21 Mcgivern St
Box 1300
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 881-2071
Fax: (519) 370-2513

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brockton And Area
Family Health Team
21 Mcgivern St
Box 1300
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 881-2071
Fax: (519) 370-2513

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
17 Jun 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 17 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from July 26, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Andreas Cziffer, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cziffer to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Andreas Cziffer may not engage in the practice of long-term care
effective September 1, 2013.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from July 26, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Andreas Cziffer, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cziffer to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Andreas Cziffer may not engage in the practice of long-term care
effective September 1, 2013.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 17 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 26 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1985
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 1985