THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:49:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centenary Hospital
Hyperbaric Center
110-2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Centenary Hospital
Hyperbaric Center
110 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.M. Karski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centenary Hospital
Hyperbaric Center
110-2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Centenary Hospital
Hyperbaric Center
110 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.M. Karski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACEK MARIA KARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACEK MARIA KARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2022


DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985