THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, BULGARIAN, MACEDONIAN, POLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 05 Dec 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: P O Box 38006, 550 Eglinton Avenue West, Castlewood, Toronto, ON, M5N 1B0
Date Received: 21 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Karambolova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, BULGARIAN, MACEDONIAN, POLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 05 Dec 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: P O Box 38006, 550 Eglinton Avenue West, Castlewood, Toronto, ON, M5N 1B0
Date Received: 21 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Karambolova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2015

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2015


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985