THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:00:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Republic, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cesar Garcia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jan 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: University of the Republic, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cesar Garcia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jan 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 23 Sep 2020
Hearing Date(s): Motion: 2023-08-21 (Hearing in writing); Merits; Dec 11, 13; Jan 6, 7, 8, 13, 15, 16 & April 23 2025
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Garcia Pan’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that during a medical appointment in December, 2010, Dr. Garcia Pan engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct by, among other things, making inappropriate and/or sexual remarks to a patient, engaging in inappropriate and/or sexual touching of a patient and engaging in inappropriate and/or sexual behaviour towards a patient.
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 23 Sep 2020
Hearing Date(s): Motion: 2023-08-21 (Hearing in writing); Merits; Dec 11, 13; Jan 6, 7, 8, 13, 15, 16 & April 23 2025
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Garcia Pan’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that during a medical appointment in December, 2010, Dr. Garcia Pan engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct by, among other things, making inappropriate and/or sexual remarks to a patient, engaging in inappropriate and/or sexual touching of a patient and engaging in inappropriate and/or sexual behaviour towards a patient.
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Republic, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 28 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985