THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 15:45:17 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
211 Pritchard Rd (Medical Admin)
Hamilton
Ontario
Hamilton Ontario L8J 0G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 5238600
Extension: 4231
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
211 Pritchard Rd (Medical Admin)
Hamilton
Ontario
Hamilton Ontario L8J 0G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 5238600
Extension: 4231
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LITTLE EVERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LITTLE EVERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On September 30, 2013, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Hamilton, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Jennifer L. Everson in respect of an incident that took place in June 2006.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On September 30, 2013, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Hamilton, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Jennifer L. Everson in respect of an incident that took place in June 2006.

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1985