THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 12 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, Ontario, M3J 1Y6. Phone: 1-888-563-3732. Website: www.rsrs.com.
Date Received: 01 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emad Guirguis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Dec 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 12 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, Ontario, M3J 1Y6. Phone: 1-888-563-3732. Website: www.rsrs.com.
Date Received: 01 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emad Guirguis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Dec 2013

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 23 Nov 2020
Summary of Decision:
On January 10, 2020, allegations of Dr. Guirguis’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that Dr. Guirguis engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by performing surgical cosmetic procedures that were outside of his scope of practice, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct through his online advertising and in his communications with Patient A.

The matter was heard on November 23, 2020, by way of videoconference, in the presence of Dr. Guirguis, counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Guirguis. On the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest (Liability), the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Guirguis committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has contravened the Act, the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 or the regulations under either of those Acts; and has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would be reasonably regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Disposition
Noting that Dr. Guirguis undertook to resign from the College and never to apply or re-apply to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the Discipline Committee issued its Order dated November 24, 2020, directing that:
- Dr. Guirguis appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and
- Dr. Guirguis pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

On March 9, 2021, the Committee released its full reasons for decision, including the Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest. The decision is available for review on the College’s website.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 23, 2020

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Nov 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Emad Mikhail Guirguis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 23, 2020:

Dr. Guirguis was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations that he has contravened the Medicine Act, 1991, the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 or the regulations under either of those Acts; and that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. College investigations were also conducted into whether Dr. Guirguis engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general surgery/cosmetic surgery practice. Dr. Guirguis’s certificate of registration expired on September 4, 2020. In the face of these allegations and these investigations, Dr. Guirguis has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Apr 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Sep 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Dec 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 23 Nov 2020
Summary of Decision:
On January 10, 2020, allegations of Dr. Guirguis’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that Dr. Guirguis engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by performing surgical cosmetic procedures that were outside of his scope of practice, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct through his online advertising and in his communications with Patient A.

The matter was heard on November 23, 2020, by way of videoconference, in the presence of Dr. Guirguis, counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Guirguis. On the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest (Liability), the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Guirguis committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has contravened the Act, the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 or the regulations under either of those Acts; and has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would be reasonably regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Disposition
Noting that Dr. Guirguis undertook to resign from the College and never to apply or re-apply to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the Discipline Committee issued its Order dated November 24, 2020, directing that:
- Dr. Guirguis appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and
- Dr. Guirguis pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

On March 9, 2021, the Committee released its full reasons for decision, including the Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest. The decision is available for review on the College’s website.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 23, 2020

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Nov 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Emad Mikhail Guirguis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 23, 2020:

Dr. Guirguis was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations that he has contravened the Medicine Act, 1991, the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 or the regulations under either of those Acts; and that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. College investigations were also conducted into whether Dr. Guirguis engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general surgery/cosmetic surgery practice. Dr. Guirguis’s certificate of registration expired on September 4, 2020. In the face of these allegations and these investigations, Dr. Guirguis has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Apr 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Sep 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Dec 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 27 May 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 15 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985