THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Downey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Dec 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Downey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Dec 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985