THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-5668
Fax: (416) 813-6334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-5668
Fax: (416) 813-6334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHELLY KAREN WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHELLY KAREN WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985