THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:41:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 67
Greely Station Main
Greely Ontario K4P 1N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-821-0174
Fax: 613-821-0174

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 67
Greely Station Main
Greely Ontario K4P 1N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-821-0174
Fax: 613-821-0174

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUIS STEPHEN O'CONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUIS STEPHEN O'CONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 07 Apr 1994
Summary of Decision:
In April 1994, Dr. O(Connell pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. O(Connell guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently the Committee ordered:

1. That Dr. O(Connell be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2. That Dr. O(Connell be fined the sum of $5000.00 within thirty days from the date of the hearing.

3. That Dr. O(Connell(s licence to practice be suspended for a period of 180 days;

4. That 120 days of this suspension were themselves to be suspended on the condition that:

(i) Dr. O(Connell provide satisfactory proof to the Registrar that he had paid the fine;

(ii) Dr. O(Connell pay to the College the sum of $5000.00 as the costs of this prosecution within thirty days of the date of the hearing;

(iii) Dr. O(Connell perform 45 hours of community service at an AIDS hospice, and file with the Registrar satisfactory proof that he had performed such service;

5. That the suspension of Dr. O(Connell was to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar within sixty days from the date of the hearing. Provided that the above conditions were satisfied, the suspension was to be sixty days in length, served on sixty consecutive days.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 07, 1994

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 07 Apr 1994
Summary of Decision:
In April 1994, Dr. O(Connell pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. O(Connell guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently the Committee ordered:

1. That Dr. O(Connell be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2. That Dr. O(Connell be fined the sum of $5000.00 within thirty days from the date of the hearing.

3. That Dr. O(Connell(s licence to practice be suspended for a period of 180 days;

4. That 120 days of this suspension were themselves to be suspended on the condition that:

(i) Dr. O(Connell provide satisfactory proof to the Registrar that he had paid the fine;

(ii) Dr. O(Connell pay to the College the sum of $5000.00 as the costs of this prosecution within thirty days of the date of the hearing;

(iii) Dr. O(Connell perform 45 hours of community service at an AIDS hospice, and file with the Registrar satisfactory proof that he had performed such service;

5. That the suspension of Dr. O(Connell was to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar within sixty days from the date of the hearing. Provided that the above conditions were satisfied, the suspension was to be sixty days in length, served on sixty consecutive days.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 07, 1994

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 04 Aug 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 1994


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985