THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:16:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 285 Mariposa Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1M 0T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137621161
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who saw Dr. Shore up to 2019, should submit their medical record requests to [email protected]

Patients who saw Dr. Shore after 2019 should submit their medical record requests to:

Dr. Dima Hage (CPSO#141227)
9-3780 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON K2J 1A1
Phone: 613- 820-3694
Fax: 613-820-3695
Date Received: 25 Oct 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donna Shore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 285 Mariposa Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1M 0T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137621161
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who saw Dr. Shore up to 2019, should submit their medical record requests to [email protected]

Patients who saw Dr. Shore after 2019 should submit their medical record requests to:

Dr. Dima Hage (CPSO#141227)
9-3780 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON K2J 1A1
Phone: 613- 820-3694
Fax: 613-820-3695
Date Received: 25 Oct 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donna Shore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA AVA SHORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA AVA SHORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985