THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:52:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit I
989 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6C 2C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 921-6500
Fax: (416) 921-6321

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Simon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jun 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit I
989 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6C 2C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 921-6500
Fax: (416) 921-6321

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Simon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jun 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY JOSHUA SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY JOSHUA SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985