THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:27:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medicine Professional Corporation
Suite 104
200 Ronson Dr.
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 5Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 748-9183
Fax: (416) 748-9184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 28 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Bhesania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medicine Professional Corporation
Suite 104
200 Ronson Dr.
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 5Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 748-9183
Fax: (416) 748-9184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 28 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Bhesania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TEOSAR BHESANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHESANIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TEOSAR BHESANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHESANIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985