THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:53:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 27 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985