THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:53:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Feb 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 13 Jan 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985